LA HCSR2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Approved on 5/13/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Approved on 5/13/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a joint committee to study the feasibility of creating a Louisiana agricultural food commodities day in public schools
Title
Establishes a joint committee to study the feasibility of creating a Louisiana agricultural food commodities day in public schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Approved on 5/13/2021. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/10/2021. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Request study by the committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Received by the Senate Office on 5/7/2021. |
2021-05-07 | House | Sent to the Senate. |
2021-05-03 | House | Study request list distributed to members on 5/3/2021. |
2021-04-28 | House | Received on 4/27/2021. |