LA HCSR2 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Approved on 10/20/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Approved on 10/20/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs and the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs to study the compensation allocated to each member for legislative assistants and make recommendations relative thereto
Title
Requests the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs and the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs to study the compensation allocated to each member for legislative assistants and make recommendations relative thereto
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | Senate | Approved on 10/20/2020. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Study request list distributed to the members on 10/14/2020. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Received by the Senate Office on 10/14/2020. |
2020-10-14 | House | Sent to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Study request list distributed to members on 10/12/2020. |
2020-10-07 | House | Received on 10/7/2020. |