LA HCR98 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the legislature's opposition to a disproportionate increase in the taxation of oil and gas industries
Title
Expresses the legislature's opposition to a disproportionate increase in the taxation of oil and gas industries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 98 CONCUR (#751) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 98 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#717) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 98 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#717) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 6 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |