LA HCR98 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the potential value for local law enforcement agencies of an independent police monitor
Title
Recognizes the potential value for local law enforcement agencies of an independent police monitor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 98 ADOPT (#1189) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 98 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#976) (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 98 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#976) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 98 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#976) (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 98 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#976) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 78, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |