LA HCR98 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes June 2017 as Apert Awareness Month
Title
Recognizes June 2017 as Apert Awareness Month
Sponsors
Rep. John Anders [D] | Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 98 ADOPT (#512) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |