LA HCR93 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Posthumously commends Frederick Davoust "Fred" Cart for his devotion to the town of Iota, Louisiana, and for his support of Iota High School
Title
Posthumously commends Frederick Davoust "Fred" Cart for his devotion to the town of Iota, Louisiana, and for his support of Iota High School
Sponsors
Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R] | Rep. John Stefanski [R] | Sen. Mark Abraham [R] | Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] |
Sen. Heather Cloud [R] | Sen. Bob Hensgens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 93 CONCUR (#443) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/26/2021. |
2021-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |