LA HCR9 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Suspends certain authority of the governor relative to the declaration of an emergency (Item #41)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspends certain authority of the governor relative to the declaration of an emergency (Item #41)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 9 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#10) (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 9 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#10) (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-10-13SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2020-10-13SenateRules suspended.
2020-10-12SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-07SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-06SenateReported favorably.
2020-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-10-02HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 66, nays 22. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseReported favorably (15-0-1).
2020-09-29HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback