LA HCR9 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests a study relative to allowing Anatomy and Physiology to count in addition to, rather than as a substitute for, Biology II for Taylor Opportunity Program for Students (TOPS) award qualification and high school graduation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests a study relative to allowing Anatomy and Physiology to count in addition to, rather than as a substitute for, Biology II for Taylor Opportunity Program for Students (TOPS) award qualification and high school graduation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 9 ADOPT (#698) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HCR 9 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#208) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HCR 9 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#208) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2019-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-01SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2019-05-27SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-05-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably (8-0).
2019-04-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HCR9&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123234
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126934
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132635
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141019
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128201
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123235
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127159
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132766
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144963
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132595
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132832
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140696

Bill Comments

feedback