LA HCR86 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urges and requests the La. Dept. of Health to finalize plans for implementing hospital payment reform within the Medicaid program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges and requests the La. Dept. of Health to finalize plans for implementing hospital payment reform within the Medicaid program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT (#781) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#587) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2017-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-06-03SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2017-06-02SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2017-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-06-01HouseRead by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-06-01HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17.
2017-05-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-23HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2017-05-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-05-18HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HCR86&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043168
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044178
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046996
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048200
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043567
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044143
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046960
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043169
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044198
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046987
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048013

Bill Comments

feedback