LA HCR84 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to review and reform the National Flood Insurance Program's pricing methodology known as Risk Rating 2.0
Title
Memorializes Congress to review and reform the National Flood Insurance Program's pricing methodology known as Risk Rating 2.0
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 84 CONCUR (#894) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 84 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#841) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 84 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#841) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |