LA HCR83 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study of the costs and benefits of setting Medicaid reimbursement rates for primary care services equivalent to Medicare rates for those services
Title
Requests a study of the costs and benefits of setting Medicaid reimbursement rates for primary care services equivalent to Medicare rates for those services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 83 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#301) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |