LA HCR83 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences on the death of Rudolph "Chief Rudy" Belisle and posthumously commends his accomplishments
Title
Expresses condolences on the death of Rudolph "Chief Rudy" Belisle and posthumously commends his accomplishments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 83 ADOPT (#354) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |