LA HCR80 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the appointment of the membership of the House Committee on Ways and Means and the Senate Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs
Title
Provides for the appointment of the membership of the House Committee on Ways and Means and the Senate Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2018-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |