LA HCR80 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Virtual Library Study Commission to conduct a study and make recommendations regarding the development of a statewide virtual library
Title
Establishes the Virtual Library Study Commission to conduct a study and make recommendations regarding the development of a statewide virtual library
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 80 ADOPT (#802) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Vote on HCR 80 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#628) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Vote on HCR 80 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#628) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016. |
2016-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2016-04-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-04-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |