LA HCR8 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-15)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences on the death of Louisiana congressman-elect Luke Letlow

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences on the death of Louisiana congressman-elect Luke Letlow

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 8 CO-AUTHORS (#16) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 8 ADOPT (#15) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-04-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-04-14HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-04-13SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2021-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback