LA HCR8 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes La. Irish Week in March in celebration of the state's rich Irish heritage
Title
Recognizes La. Irish Week in March in celebration of the state's rich Irish heritage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 8, ADOPT (#11) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |