LA HCR8 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to state procurement contracts let via a request for proposal process (OR SEE FISC NOTE)
Title
Provides with respect to state procurement contracts let via a request for proposal process (OR SEE FISC NOTE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2010-03-30 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HCR8 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=690036 |