LA HCR79 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Riverside Academy High School softball team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2023 Select Division IV state championship
Title
Commends the Riverside Academy High School softball team on winning the Louisiana High School Athletic Association 2023 Select Division IV state championship
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] | Rep. Randal Gaines [D] | Sen. Gregory Miller [R] | Sen. Edward Price [D] |
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 79 CONCUR (#244) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-05-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |