LA HCR79 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a study of adding a shoulder to Louisiana Highway 19 between north Zachary and the Mississippi state line
Title
Provides for a study of adding a shoulder to Louisiana Highway 19 between north Zachary and the Mississippi state line
Sponsors
Rep. Daryl Adams [I] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on HCR 79 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1128) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |