LA HCR79 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests that any proclamation convening an extraordinary session of the legislature in 2020 include changes to eligibility requirements to participate in the Enterprise Zone incentive
Title
Urges and requests that any proclamation convening an extraordinary session of the legislature in 2020 include changes to eligibility requirements to participate in the Enterprise Zone incentive
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 79 ADOPT (#320) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 79 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#204) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 79 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#204) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-26 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |