LA HCR78 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Board of Regents to study alternative uses of underutilized facilities at public postsecondary education institutions
Title
Urges and requests the Board of Regents to study alternative uses of underutilized facilities at public postsecondary education institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 78, ADOPT (#463) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-06-13 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-09 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-09 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-05-09 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |