LA HCR75 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study the feasibility and reasonableness of increasing the gross vehicle weight and axle weight limits for an annual permit
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study the feasibility and reasonableness of increasing the gross vehicle weight and axle weight limits for an annual permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 75 CONCUR (#772) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Vote on HCR 75 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#633) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Vote on HCR 75 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#633) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-13 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |