LA HCR68 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 57. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 57. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study the length and danger of longer freight trains
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study the length and danger of longer freight trains
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 68 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#703) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 57. Failed to pass. |
2021-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |