LA HCR60 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends the members and board of directors of the Louisiana School Boards Association for their commitment to advancing education in the state

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends the members and board of directors of the Louisiana School Boards Association for their commitment to advancing education in the state

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 60 CONCUR (#134) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2023-05-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-05-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2023-04-27SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2023-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-04-25HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback