LA HCR60 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Tuesday, May 1, 2012, as St. Tammany Day
Title
Recognizes Tuesday, May 1, 2012, as St. Tammany Day
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Hollis [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 60, ADOPT (#175) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2012-04-03 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-04-02 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-03-29 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-03-29 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2012-03-28 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |