LA HCR6 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes April 10, 2019, as Louisiana Nurse Day at the state capitol and May 6-12, 2019, as National Nurses Week in Louisiana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes April 10, 2019, as Louisiana Nurse Day at the state capitol and May 6-12, 2019, as National Nurses Week in Louisiana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 6 ADOPT (#22) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-04-09SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2019-04-08SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback