LA HCR59 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urges the Supreme Court of La. to approve CLE credit for full-time legislative staff attorneys

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges the Supreme Court of La. to approve CLE credit for full-time legislative staff attorneys

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 59 ADOPT (#489) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 59 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#434) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2021-05-25SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2021-05-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-06HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback