LA HCR59 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a special council to make recommendations concerning the potential establishment of a Commission on the Aging and Adults with Disabilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a special council to make recommendations concerning the potential establishment of a Commission on the Aging and Adults with Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseWithdrawn from the files of the House.
2019-05-21HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback