LA HCR59 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated, on its one hundred twelfth anniversary and recognizes April 24, 2018, as Alpha Phi Alpha Day at the state capitol
Title
Commends Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Incorporated, on its one hundred twelfth anniversary and recognizes April 24, 2018, as Alpha Phi Alpha Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 59 ADOPT (#487) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |