LA HCR58 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 19, 2021, as CODOFIL Day at the state capitol
Title
Designates May 19, 2021, as CODOFIL Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HCR 58 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#585) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 58 CONCUR (#257) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 58 CONCUR (#257) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/20/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/11/2021. |
2021-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |