LA HCR58 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Baker High School Symphonic Band for its many achievements and for participating in the March 2018 Conductor-Composer Clinic at Carnegie Hall in New York
Title
Commends the Baker High School Symphonic Band for its many achievements and for participating in the March 2018 Conductor-Composer Clinic at Carnegie Hall in New York
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 58 ADOPT (#492) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |