LA HCR57 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education (BESE) to implement "Aliye's Law" and provide instruction to students on organ donation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education (BESE) to implement "Aliye's Law" and provide instruction to students on organ donation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 57 CONCUR (#1392) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House Vote on HCR 57 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#957) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2024-06-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2024-05-31HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2024-05-31HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2024-05-31SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2024-05-31SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2024-05-23SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2024-05-23SenateRules suspended.
2024-05-22SenateReported favorably.
2024-05-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2024-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2024-05-09HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 79, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2024-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024.
2024-05-01HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2024-04-30HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2024-04-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2024-04-08HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback