LA HCR57 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-17-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-17-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Legislature of Louisiana to support the "Greaux the Good" farmers market match program
Title
Urges and requests the Legislature of Louisiana to support the "Greaux the Good" farmers market match program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 57 CONCUR (#564) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 57 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#521) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 57 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#521) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2022. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |