LA HCR55 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to study Louisiana's current statewide system of healthcare delivery for Medicaid enrollees with serious mental illness
Title
Creates a task force to study Louisiana's current statewide system of healthcare delivery for Medicaid enrollees with serious mental illness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 55 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#862) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 55 ADOPT (#778) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 55 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#535) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 55 ADOPT (#778) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 55 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#535) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/17. |
2017-05-24 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-05-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |