LA HCR50 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study concerning health insurance coverage of interpreter services for the deaf and hard of hearing in healthcare settings
Title
Requests a study concerning health insurance coverage of interpreter services for the deaf and hard of hearing in healthcare settings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 50 CO-AUTHORS (#591) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 50 ADOPT (#590) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 50 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#486) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 50 ADOPT (#590) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 50 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#486) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |