LA HCR50 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the collection of comprehensive information concerning an individual who suffered a violent death
Title
Provides relative to the collection of comprehensive information concerning an individual who suffered a violent death
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 50 CONCUR (#1281) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 50 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1005) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 50 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1005) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 80, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-03 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |