LA HCR50 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes congress to provide for certain aspects of the RESTORE Act
Title
Memorializes congress to provide for certain aspects of the RESTORE Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 50 CONCUR (#711) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House Vote on HCR 50 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#424) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House Vote on HCR 50 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#424) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-06 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2014. |
2014-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2014-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |