LA HCR44 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 96-45-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 96-45-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences on the death of state representative Reggie Paul Bagala
Title
Expresses condolences on the death of state representative Reggie Paul Bagala
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 44 ADOPT (#77) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |