LA HCR44 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 93-48-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences on the death of state representative Reggie Paul Bagala

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences on the death of state representative Reggie Paul Bagala

Sponsors

Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]
Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]
Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]
Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]Rep. Michael Echols [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Les Farnum [R]
Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]
Rep. Larry Frieman [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]
Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Charles Henry [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. John Illg [R]
Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]
Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]
Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Scott McKnight [R]
Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]
Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Robert Owen [R]Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Troy Romero [R]
Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Phillip Tarver [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Debbie Villio [R]Rep. William Wheat [R]
Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]
Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Louie Bernard [R]
Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Joseph Bouie [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]
Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Michael Fesi [R]
Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]Sen. Cameron Henry [R]
Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Patrick McMath [R]Sen. Barry Milligan [R]
Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. John Morris [R]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]
Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]
Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]Sen. Glen Womack [R]

Roll Calls

2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 44 ADOPT (#77) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-13HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-11SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2020-05-07SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback