LA HCR43 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the secretary of La. Dept. of Health to reconsider the department's policy of excluding the majority of Medicaid enrollees from quarterly income verification
Title
Urges the secretary of La. Dept. of Health to reconsider the department's policy of excluding the majority of Medicaid enrollees from quarterly income verification
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 43 ADOPT (#191) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |