LA HCR34 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests a study regarding potential means of financing dental care for adult residents of intermediate care facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests a study regarding potential means of financing dental care for adult residents of intermediate care facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HCR 34 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#584) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 34 CONCUR (#374) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HCR 34 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#179) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-05-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-24HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/20/2021.
2021-05-17HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-17SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2021-05-12SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-04SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-28HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-27HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2021-04-20HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-19HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HCR34&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214957
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218029
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226767
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216970
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217902
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223910
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223172
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214958
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218087
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224081
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225483
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237001
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225321
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226737

Bill Comments 750

feedback