LA HCR31 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends provision of law capping amount of revenue which can be spent on in-state advertising (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Suspends provision of law capping amount of revenue which can be spent on in-state advertising (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 31 ADOPT (#332) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 31 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#181) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 31 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#181) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (21-0). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |