LA HCR31 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes congress to maintain the current incentives for mid-level oil and gas exploration and production
Title
Memorializes congress to maintain the current incentives for mid-level oil and gas exploration and production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-05-17 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-05-03 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 3, 2010. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-04-20 | Reported favorably (10-0-1). | |
2010-03-30 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |