LA HCR30 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences on the death of Earl Joseph Thibodaux
Title
Expresses condolences on the death of Earl Joseph Thibodaux
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 30 CONCUR (#34) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-03-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |