LA HCR30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests continued support for the efforts by the state of Louisiana and others in the Mississippi River Basin to work together toward achieving the goals of the Gulf Hypoxia Action Plan and a reduction of the hypoxic zone off the state's coast
Title
Urges and requests continued support for the efforts by the state of Louisiana and others in the Mississippi River Basin to work together toward achieving the goals of the Gulf Hypoxia Action Plan and a reduction of the hypoxic zone off the state's coast
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 30 ADOPT (#330) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |