LA HCR30 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Toni Jarreau on her outstanding achievements in four years of wrestling at Walker High School
Title
Commends Toni Jarreau on her outstanding achievements in four years of wrestling at Walker High School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 30 CONCUR (#60) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-03-21 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |