LA HCR25 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the suspension of all civil prescriptive, peremptive, filing, and other deadlines in response to the COVID-19 Public Health Emergency declared by the governor
Title
Provides for the suspension of all civil prescriptive, peremptive, filing, and other deadlines in response to the COVID-19 Public Health Emergency declared by the governor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 25 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#185) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0-1). |
2020-03-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |