LA HCR245 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the La. State Law Institute to evaluate progress toward achieving the "Missouri Model" of juvenile justice reform
Title
Urges and requests the La. State Law Institute to evaluate progress toward achieving the "Missouri Model" of juvenile justice reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 245, ADOPT (#1659) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |
2010-06-15 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2010-06-14 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-06-14 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |