LA HCR24 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-35-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends Daryl Purpera on his retirement from service as legislative auditor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends Daryl Purpera on his retirement from service as legislative auditor

Sponsors

Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]
Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]
Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]
Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]
Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Les Farnum [R]Rep. Gabe Firment [R]
Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Larry Frieman [R]
Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Brett Geymann [R]
Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]
Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. John Illg [R]Rep. Edward James [D]
Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]
Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]
Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]
Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]
Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]
Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]
Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Joseph Orgeron [R]
Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Robert Owen [R]Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]
Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Troy Romero [R]Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Phillip Tarver [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Rep. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Debbie Villio [R]Rep. William Wheat [R]
Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]

Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House Vote on HCR 24 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#39) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 24 ADOPT (#33) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-04-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-04-26HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-04-21HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for concurrence on 04/21/2021.
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-04-19SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2021-04-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-14HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback