LA HCR23 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes April 17, 2019, as March of Dimes Day at the state capitol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes April 17, 2019, as March of Dimes Day at the state capitol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 23 ADOPT (#48) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-04-16HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-04-16SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2019-04-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-10HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback